California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Amended

Bill August 7, 2020
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019