California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019