California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 10, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019