Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Read first time. To print. |