California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2019

Amended

Bill July 2, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019