|
07/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1879.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1522.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|