Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Read first time. To print. |