California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill July 7, 2020
Bill January 6, 2020
Bill March 26, 2019