|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 3144.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 2091.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|