|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
(Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3033.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Bill in its final form passes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Vote on concurrence in final form pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2440.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|