Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
(pending re-referral to Com. on G.O.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1238.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1238.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|