Senate
|
07/02/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|