Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2183.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|