California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill June 25, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019