|
09/18/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 5224.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 4297.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 3866.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|