Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 4. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | Introduced. To print. |