|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 3146.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2584.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|