10/11/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2019. | |||
10/11/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/17/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2692.). | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 1614.) | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |