Senate | 06/19/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.) | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |