10/02/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2019. | |||
10/02/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/23/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2727.). | ||
Senate | 08/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 1630.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |