Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1631.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|