California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019