Senate | 07/02/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2072.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2018 | Introduced. To print. |