|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2942.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2238.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 1764.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|