California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019