Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
Died on third reading file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2020
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|