|
10/04/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3013.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2439.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2118.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1857.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|