California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019