Senate | 07/02/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |