Senate | 07/03/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2110.) | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |