Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 11. | ||
Assembly | 12/11/2018 | Introduced. To print. |