California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 11, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019