Senate | 07/09/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 2127.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |