California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill June 19, 2019
Bill June 6, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019