California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill June 17, 2020
Bill January 23, 2020
Bill September 4, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019