|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2565.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|