California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 6, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill March 11, 2019