Senate | 08/30/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1892.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |