Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2019 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Grayson. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1721.) | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |