|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 3496.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2860.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 2098.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|