Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2019 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |