California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019