|
09/06/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2837.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2239.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1520.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|