|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1349.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|