Senate | 07/11/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1403.) | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |