California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 11, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019