Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|