California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill August 26, 2019
Bill July 8, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill June 5, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019