Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|