Assembly | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |